THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:22:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional
Health Science Centre
Pathology Department
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6584
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Welbourne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Welbourne (CPSO#: 60751 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Science Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6584

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional
Health Science Centre
Pathology Department
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6584
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Welbourne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jun 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Welbourne (CPSO#: 60751 )
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health Science Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6584

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ROBERT WELBOURNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELBOURNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID ROBERT WELBOURNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WELBOURNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1989