THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:23:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C/O Towngate Family Medicine Clinic
2446 Bank Street
Suite 201
Ottawa Ontario K1V 1A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 739-0998
Fax: (613) 739-1485

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anik Vandewaetere Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vandewaetere (CPSO#: 60752 )
Business Address: C/O Towngate Family Medicine Clinic
201 - 2446 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 1A4
(613) 739-0998

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: C/O Towngate Family Medicine Clinic
2446 Bank Street
Suite 201
Ottawa Ontario K1V 1A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 739-0998
Fax: (613) 739-1485

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anik Vandewaetere Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Vandewaetere (CPSO#: 60752 )
Business Address: C/O Towngate Family Medicine Clinic
201 - 2446 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1V 1A4
(613) 739-0998

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIK ROSE-MARIE VANDEWAETERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDEWAETERE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIK ROSE-MARIE VANDEWAETERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VANDEWAETERE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989