THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 00:42:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 504-2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-820-8770
Fax: 905-820-3703

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 08 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon KT Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wong (CPSO#: 60768 )
Business Address: 9058208770

Corporation Name: Gordon KT Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jan 2025

Corporation Name: Gordon KT Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 504-2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-820-8770
Fax: 905-820-3703

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 08 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gordon KT Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Dec 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Wong (CPSO#: 60768 )
Business Address: 9058208770

Corporation Name: Gordon KT Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jan 2025

Corporation Name: Gordon KT Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 22 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON KWOK TUNG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GORDON KWOK TUNG WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989