THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 06:59:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Adult Outpatient Psychiatry
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057406511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Adult Outpatient Psychiatry
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: 705-876-5002
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter L. Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lipcsei (CPSO#: 60788 ) Dr. P. Hughes (CPSO#: 61084 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Adult Outpatient Psychiatry
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057406511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Adult Outpatient Psychiatry
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7C6
Phone: 705-876-5002
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter L. Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Oct 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lipcsei (CPSO#: 60788 ) Dr. P. Hughes (CPSO#: 61084 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE LIPCSEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPCSEI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIE ANNE LIPCSEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIPCSEI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989