THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:48:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARMENIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2020 Brimley Road
Toronto Ontario M1S 4R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162935511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4040 Finch Ave E
SUITE 108
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
Phone: 4162933233
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1371 Neilson Rd
SUITE 306
Scarborough ON M1B 4Z8
Phone: 4162829119
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1371 Neilson Road
Suite 306
Toronto Ontario M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416)282-9119
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 08 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Berge Marcarian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Marcarian (CPSO#: 60790 )
Business Address: 2020 Brimley Road
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4R7
(416) 293-5511

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARMENIAN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2020 Brimley Road
Toronto Ontario M1S 4R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4162935511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4040 Finch Ave E
SUITE 108
Scarborough ON M1S 4V5
Phone: 4162933233
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1371 Neilson Rd
SUITE 306
Scarborough ON M1B 4Z8
Phone: 4162829119
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1371 Neilson Road
Suite 306
Toronto Ontario M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416)282-9119
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 08 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Berge Marcarian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Marcarian (CPSO#: 60790 )
Business Address: 2020 Brimley Road
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4R7
(416) 293-5511

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERGE MARCARIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCARIAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BERGE MARCARIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARCARIAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989