THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:49:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Avenue
MaRS 9093
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-3512
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Agincourt Pulmonary Services
240 Alton Towers Circle
Suite 208
Scarborough Ontario M1V 4P3
Phone: (416) 321-2613
Fax: (416) 321-6844

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chung-Wai Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chow (CPSO#: 60797 )
Business Address: 585 University Ave
MaRS 9093
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
416-340-3512

Corporation Name: Dr. Chung-Wai Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Avenue
MaRS 9093
Toronto Ontario M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-3512
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Agincourt Pulmonary Services
240 Alton Towers Circle
Suite 208
Scarborough Ontario M1V 4P3
Phone: (416) 321-2613
Fax: (416) 321-6844

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chung-Wai Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Chow (CPSO#: 60797 )
Business Address: 585 University Ave
MaRS 9093
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
416-340-3512

Corporation Name: Dr. Chung-Wai Chow Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHUNG-WAI CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHUNG-WAI CHOW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHOW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989