THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:52:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 377 Church Street
Suite 206
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-6551
Fax: (905) 472-5490

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 21 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geenen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Geenen (CPSO#: 60811 )
Business Address: Suite 206
377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 472-6551

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 377 Church Street
Suite 206
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 472-6551
Fax: (905) 472-5490

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 21 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Geenen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Oct 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Geenen (CPSO#: 60811 )
Business Address: Suite 206
377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
(905) 472-6551

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE LOUISE GEENEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEENEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAROLINE LOUISE GEENEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GEENEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989