THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:02:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 43919
Fax: (905) 381-7053

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 05 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ved Tandan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tandan (CPSO#: 60813 )
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43919

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 43919
Fax: (905) 381-7053

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 05 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: West Lincoln Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Grimsby

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ved Tandan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jan 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. V. Tandan (CPSO#: 60813 )
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton Ontario L8V 1C3
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 43919

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VED RAOUL TANDAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANDAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VED RAOUL TANDAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANDAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989