THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:33:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
M1-302a
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 480-5882
Fax: 844-222-4518
Address: 340 College Street
Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5T3A9
Phone: 4169282132
Fax: 4169286607

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 12 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.M. Birt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Birt (CPSO#: 60820 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M1 302A
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5882
Business Address: 600 - 350 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
(416) 978-7931

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
M1-302a
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 480-5882
Fax: 844-222-4518
Address: 340 College Street
Suite 602
Toronto Ontario M5T3A9
Phone: 4169282132
Fax: 4169286607

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 12 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Kensington Eye Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.M. Birt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Aug 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Birt (CPSO#: 60820 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M1 302A
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-5882
Business Address: 600 - 350 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
(416) 978-7931

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARY BIRT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARY BIRT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Aug 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989