THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:20:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 306
15 Gallie Court
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 721-3344
Fax: (705) 721-5522
Address: LL1 5 Quarry Ridge Rd.
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 797-1112
Fax: (705) 797-1113

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 28 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Hemphill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hemphill (CPSO#: 60856 )
Business Address: 306 - 15 Gallie Court
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 721-3344

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 306
15 Gallie Court
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 721-3344
Fax: (705) 721-5522
Address: LL1 5 Quarry Ridge Rd.
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 797-1112
Fax: (705) 797-1113

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 28 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Barrie

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Douglas Hemphill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jun 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Hemphill (CPSO#: 60856 )
Business Address: 306 - 15 Gallie Court
Barrie Ontario L4M 7G1
(705) 721-3344

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JOHN HEMPHILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEMPHILL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS JOHN HEMPHILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HEMPHILL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1992
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1992

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989