THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 04:33:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
3292 Bayview Avenue
North York Ontario M2M 4J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 229-4179
Fax: (416) 222-8088
Address: 247 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B9
Phone: (905) 273-3045
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-8 Green Lane
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
Phone: 905-764-0188
Fax: 905-764-0189
Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Willowdale Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 22 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Schiffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Schiffer (CPSO#: 60864 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
3292 Bayview Avenue
North York Ontario M2M 4J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 229-4179
Fax: (416) 222-8088
Address: 247 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 1B9
Phone: (905) 273-3045
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-8 Green Lane
Thornhill ON L3T 7P7
Phone: 905-764-0188
Fax: 905-764-0189
Address: North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Willowdale Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 22 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 22 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Schiffer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jan 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Schiffer (CPSO#: 60864 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA JEAN SCHIFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIFFER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA JEAN SCHIFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCHIFFER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989