THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:47:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit C216
777 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 977-8878
Fax: (416) 977-0118

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Albert S.C. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wong (CPSO#: 60871 )
Business Address: Unit C216
777 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C8
(416) 977-8878

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Unit C216
777 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 977-8878
Fax: (416) 977-0118

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Albert S.C. Wong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Dec 2004
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Wong (CPSO#: 60871 )
Business Address: Unit C216
777 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C8
(416) 977-8878

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBERT SEE CHEE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALBERT SEE CHEE WONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989