THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:13:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6247
Fax: (519) 646-6039
Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Barry MacMillan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. MacMillan (CPSO#: 60873 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Road
Room B2-409
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 646-6247

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Road
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6247
Fax: (519) 646-6039
Address: St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Barry MacMillan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. J. MacMillan (CPSO#: 60873 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Road
Room B2-409
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 646-6247

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH BARRY MACMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACMILLAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOSEPH BARRY MACMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989