THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:52:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2
3350 Merrittville Highway
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 641-5556
Fax: (905) 641-5574

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 11 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tom Song Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Song (CPSO#: 60882 )
Business Address: 2 - 3350 Merrittville Highway
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
(905) 641-5556

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 2
3350 Merrittville Highway
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 641-5556
Fax: (905) 641-5574

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 11 Sep 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tom Song Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jul 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Song (CPSO#: 60882 )
Business Address: 2 - 3350 Merrittville Highway
Thorold Ontario L2V 4Y6
(905) 641-5556

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TOM TAI YOUNG SONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TOM TAI YOUNG SONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SONG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1989