THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 04:57:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6106
Fax: (519) 646-6213

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Gratton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gratton (CPSO#: 60909 )
Business Address: Lonon Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road
Suite B2-401
London Ontario N6H 5W9
(519) 646-6106

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Dept of Obstetrics and Gynaecology
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Rd
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 646-6106
Fax: (519) 646-6213

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Gratton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Gratton (CPSO#: 60909 )
Business Address: Lonon Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road
Suite B2-401
London Ontario N6H 5W9
(519) 646-6106

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JEFFREY GRATTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRATTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JEFFREY GRATTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GRATTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1989