THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:19:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FINNISH, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division Of Haematology
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 739-6021
Fax: (613) 737-8861

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 31 Dec 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Isabelle Bence-Bruckler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Bence-Bruckler (CPSO#: 60927 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Box 704
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 739-6021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FINNISH, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Division Of Haematology
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 739-6021
Fax: (613) 737-8861

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 31 Dec 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Isabelle Bence-Bruckler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Bence-Bruckler (CPSO#: 60927 )
Business Address: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Box 704
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
(613) 739-6021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISABELLE ANDRI BENCE-BRUCKLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENCE-BRUCKLER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ISABELLE ANDRI BENCE-BRUCKLER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BENCE-BRUCKLER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989