THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:11:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wingham Medical Centre
7-271 Frances St
Box 909
Wingham Ontario N0G 2W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 357-2500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Antoniadis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Antoniadis (CPSO#: 60931 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Wingham Medical Centre
7-271 Frances St
Box 909
Wingham Ontario N0G 2W0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 357-2500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Listowel Memorial Hospital Listowel
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Listowel Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Listowel

HOSPITAL: Wingham and District Hospital
LOCATION: Wingham

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Antoniadis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Antoniadis (CPSO#: 60931 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY ANTONIOS ANTONIADIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTONIADIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GREGORY ANTONIOS ANTONIADIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANTONIADIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989