THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:04:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 31023
725 College Street
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M6G 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-576-4024
Fax: 416-588-4024
Address: 38-4801 Keele St
Toronto ON M6G 1C0
Phone: 4165764024
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Jan 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 31 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. LEORA PINHAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pinhas (CPSO#: 60935 )
Business Address: PO BOX 31023, 725 COLLEGE ST.
TORONTO ONTARIO M6G1CO
4165884024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: PO Box 31023
725 College Street
Toronto
Toronto Ontario M6G 1C0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-576-4024
Fax: 416-588-4024
Address: 38-4801 Keele St
Toronto ON M6G 1C0
Phone: 4165764024
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 31 Jan 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 31 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. LEORA PINHAS MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Pinhas (CPSO#: 60935 )
Business Address: PO BOX 31023, 725 COLLEGE ST.
TORONTO ONTARIO M6G1CO
4165884024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEORA PINHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINHAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEORA PINHAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PINHAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989