THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:46:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105-645 Remembrance Rd
Unit B105
Brampton ON L7A 5H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-499-2887
Fax: 289-720-2074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.E.M. Nixon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nixon (CPSO#: 60950 )
Business Address: 202-9780 Bramalea Rd
Brampton ON L6S 2P1
Business Address: unit b105-645 Remembrance Road
Brampton Ontario L7A 5H2
905-499-2887

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 105-645 Remembrance Rd
Unit B105
Brampton ON L7A 5H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-499-2887
Fax: 289-720-2074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.E.M. Nixon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nixon (CPSO#: 60950 )
Business Address: 202-9780 Bramalea Rd
Brampton ON L6S 2P1
Business Address: unit b105-645 Remembrance Road
Brampton Ontario L7A 5H2
905-499-2887

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANE ESTHER MARY NIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIXON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANE ESTHER MARY NIXON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIXON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989