THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 02:51:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 217 Turcotte Park Road
Mattawa Hospital
Mattawa Ontario P0H 1V0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 744-6000
Fax: (705) 744-6011

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital de Mattawa Hospital Inc. Mattawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital de Mattawa Hospital Inc.
LOCATION: Mattawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leonard Gushe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gushe (CPSO#: 60981 )
Business Address: 217 Turcotte Park Road
Box 599
Mattawa ON P0H1V0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 217 Turcotte Park Road
Mattawa Hospital
Mattawa Ontario P0H 1V0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 744-6000
Fax: (705) 744-6011

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital de Mattawa Hospital Inc. Mattawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital de Mattawa Hospital Inc.
LOCATION: Mattawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Leonard Gushe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Gushe (CPSO#: 60981 )
Business Address: 217 Turcotte Park Road
Box 599
Mattawa ON P0H1V0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEONARD DAVID GUSHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUSHE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEONARD DAVID GUSHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUSHE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 06 Mar 2024
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 06 Mar 2024
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
               
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed.  A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee.  The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015, or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989