THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:48:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 214
849 Alexander Court
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-4544
Fax: (705) 876-4548

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 04 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony J. Petrasek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Petrasek (CPSO#: 60988 )
Business Address: Alexander Medical Building
214 - 849 Alexander Court
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7H8
(705) 876-4544

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 214
849 Alexander Court
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7H8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 876-4544
Fax: (705) 876-4548

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 04 Nov 1996
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 04 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony J. Petrasek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 May 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Petrasek (CPSO#: 60988 )
Business Address: Alexander Medical Building
214 - 849 Alexander Court
Peterborough Ontario K9J 7H8
(705) 876-4544

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY JOHN PETRASEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRASEK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY JOHN PETRASEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRASEK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989