THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 04:16:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital
Medicine JHCC A3 69
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73953
Fax: (905) 528-1662
Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 73953
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ameen Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Patel (CPSO#: 60995 )
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Centre
Suite A3-69
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Juravinski Hospital
Medicine JHCC A3 69
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 73953
Fax: (905) 528-1662
Address: 237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 73953
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 03 Jun 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 03 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Massachusetts

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Chedoke Hospital Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ameen Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2008
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Patel (CPSO#: 60995 )
Business Address: Juravinski Hospital & Cancer Centre
Suite A3-69
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED AMEEN PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMED AMEEN PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 1989