THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:23:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2126
Fax: (416) 946-6561

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Yi-Jen Sun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sun (CPSO#: 61025 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
University Health Network
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2126

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 946-2126
Fax: (416) 946-6561

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Yi-Jen Sun Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2011
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sun (CPSO#: 61025 )
Business Address: Princess Margaret Hospital
University Health Network
610 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 2M9
(416) 946-2126

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER YI-JEN SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER YI-JEN SUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989