THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:05:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 123 Edward St
Provis-Rudd Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 400
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)5970997
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-6124 Tecumseh Rd E
Southern Ontario Endoscopy
Windsor ON N8T 1E6
Phone: 519 915-9494
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 08 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lin (CPSO#: 61051 )
Business Address: 1016 Monmouth Rd
Windsor ON N8Y 3L7
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4421
Business Address: 718-125 Redpath Ave
Suite 718
Toronto ON M4S 0B5
5195627952

Corporation Name: Dr. W. D. Callaghan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 123 Edward St
Provis-Rudd Endoscopy Clinic
Suite 400
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416)5970997
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-6124 Tecumseh Rd E
Southern Ontario Endoscopy
Windsor ON N8T 1E6
Phone: 519 915-9494
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 08 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 08 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Lin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Lin (CPSO#: 61051 )
Business Address: 1016 Monmouth Rd
Windsor ON N8Y 3L7
Business Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor Ontario N9A 1E1
(519) 973-4421
Business Address: 718-125 Redpath Ave
Suite 718
Toronto ON M4S 0B5
5195627952

Corporation Name: Dr. W. D. Callaghan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 May 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY MEI-LING LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARY MEI-LING LIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1989