THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:33:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emo Clinic
PO Box 569
Emo Ontario P0W 1E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 482-2323
Extension: 5660
Fax: (807) 482-3089

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Emo Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Emo
HOSPITAL: Emo Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Emo

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberly Meyers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. k. meyers (CPSO#: 61053 )
Business Address: Emo Clinic
260 Front Street
PO Box 569
Emo Ontario P0W 1E0
(807) 274-3266

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emo Clinic
PO Box 569
Emo Ontario P0W 1E0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 482-2323
Extension: 5660
Fax: (807) 482-3089

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Emo Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Emo
HOSPITAL: Emo Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Emo

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kimberly Meyers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 May 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. k. meyers (CPSO#: 61053 )
Business Address: Emo Clinic
260 Front Street
PO Box 569
Emo Ontario P0W 1E0
(807) 274-3266

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY LOIS MEYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEYERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMBERLY LOIS MEYERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEYERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1989