THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:21:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 110
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 569-8100
Fax: (905) 607-3384

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 21 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Nadarajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nadarajah (CPSO#: 61077 )
Business Address: 110 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
(905) 569-8100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 110
2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 569-8100
Fax: (905) 607-3384

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 21 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 21 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Nadarajah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Sep 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Nadarajah (CPSO#: 61077 )
Business Address: 110 - 2000 Credit Valley Road
Mississauga Ontario L5M 4N4
(905) 569-8100

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUMATHI NADARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADARAJAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUMATHI NADARAJAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NADARAJAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989