THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
26/05/25 04:55:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Surgery
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus, C8-124
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3355
Fax: (519) 663-3264

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 07 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Quan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Quan (CPSO#: 61106 )
Business Address:

Corporation Name: D. Quan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Department of Surgery
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus, C8-124
339 Windermere Road
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3355
Fax: (519) 663-3264

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 07 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 07 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre London
St Joseph's Health Care, London London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care, London
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Quan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2025
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Quan (CPSO#: 61106 )
Business Address:

Corporation Name: D. Quan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS QUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS QUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1989