THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 02:34:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill Ontario L3T 4X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 881-6667
Fax: (905) 731-1298

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Renee Blumenfeld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Blumenfeld (CPSO#: 61112 )
Business Address: Suite 206
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill Ontario L3T 4X1
(905) 881-6667

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 206
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill Ontario L3T 4X1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 881-6667
Fax: (905) 731-1298

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Renee Blumenfeld Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Blumenfeld (CPSO#: 61112 )
Business Address: Suite 206
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill Ontario L3T 4X1
(905) 881-6667

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RENEE BLUMENFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLUMENFELD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RENEE BLUMENFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLUMENFELD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989