THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:10:05 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kensington Eye Institute
Suite 501
340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 928 1335
Fax: 416 928 5075

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 08 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Defrawy Bates Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bates (CPSO#: 60745 ) Dr. S. El-Defrawy (CPSO#: 61132 )
Business Address: Toronto Rehab Institute
550 University Avenue
Suite 5-142
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
(647) 621-5973
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(647) 621-6129
Business Address: Kensington Eye Institute
400 - 340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
(647) 621-6129

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Kensington Eye Institute
Suite 501
340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 928 1335
Fax: 416 928 5075

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 08 Nov 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: El-Defrawy Bates Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bates (CPSO#: 60745 ) Dr. S. El-Defrawy (CPSO#: 61132 )
Business Address: Toronto Rehab Institute
550 University Avenue
Suite 5-142
Toronto Ontario M5G 2A2
(647) 621-5973
Business Address: Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 2S8
(647) 621-6129
Business Address: Kensington Eye Institute
400 - 340 College Street
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
(647) 621-6129

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERIF RASHAD EL-DEFRAWY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-DEFRAWY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHERIF RASHAD EL-DEFRAWY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-DEFRAWY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989