THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:23:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
567 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 538-6653
Fax: (416) 538-9766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rui Martins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Martins (CPSO#: 61147 )
Business Address: 77 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B3
(416) 323-6067
Business Address: 203 - 567 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1B2
(416) 538-6653
Business Address: 351 Christie Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 3C3
(416) 392-5764

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
567 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 538-6653
Fax: (416) 538-9766

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rui Martins Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Jun 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Martins (CPSO#: 61147 )
Business Address: 77 Grenville Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 1B3
(416) 323-6067
Business Address: 203 - 567 College Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 1B2
(416) 538-6653
Business Address: 351 Christie Street
Toronto Ontario M6G 3C3
(416) 392-5764

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUI FERNANDO MARTINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUI FERNANDO MARTINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTINS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989