THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:44:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-840 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 778 9692
Fax: 416 778 7669

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 20 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Craig Sokoluk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sokoluk (CPSO#: 61154 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
Room K-407
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 778-9692
Business Address: 840 Coxwell Ave
Medical Centre
Suite 303
East York ON M4C 5T2
416 778-9692
Business Address: 840 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital Medical Centre
Suite 303
East York ON M4C 5T2
416 778 9692

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 303-840 Coxwell Ave
East York ON M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 778 9692
Fax: 416 778 7669

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 20 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Craig Sokoluk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Dec 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sokoluk (CPSO#: 61154 )
Business Address: Toronto East General Hospital
Room K-407
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 3E7
(416) 778-9692
Business Address: 840 Coxwell Ave
Medical Centre
Suite 303
East York ON M4C 5T2
416 778-9692
Business Address: 840 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital Medical Centre
Suite 303
East York ON M4C 5T2
416 778 9692

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRAIG ALLAN SOKOLUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOKOLUK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CRAIG ALLAN SOKOLUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SOKOLUK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 1993
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Mar 1993

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989