THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:14:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1985
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 214
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 463-6280
Fax: (416) 463-9480

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 08 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Everton S. Nicholas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Nicholas (CPSO#: 61161 )
Business Address: Suite 214
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
(416) 463-6280

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 214
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 463-6280
Fax: (416) 463-9480

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 08 Sep 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 16 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Toronto East Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Toronto East Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Everton S. Nicholas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jun 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Nicholas (CPSO#: 61161 )
Business Address: Suite 214
840 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4C 5T2
(416) 463-6280

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVERTON SYLVESTER NICHOLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EVERTON SYLVESTER NICHOLAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1989