THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:12:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 350
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 255-9584
Fax: (519) 255-9908

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liebman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Liebman (CPSO#: 61176 )
Business Address: Suite 350
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
(519) 255-9584

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 350
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 255-9584
Fax: (519) 255-9908

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Nov 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 09 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liebman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Liebman (CPSO#: 61176 )
Business Address: Suite 350
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
(519) 255-9584

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAEL MARTIN LIEBMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEBMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAEL MARTIN LIEBMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEBMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Mar 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989