THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:34:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Craig St
PO BOX 610
Russell ON K4R 1E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134453220
Fax: 6134453659

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wallace Archibald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Archibald (CPSO#: 61213 )
Business Address: 110 Craig Street
PO Box 610
Russell Ontario K4R 1E7
613 445-3220

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 110 Craig St
PO BOX 610
Russell ON K4R 1E7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6134453220
Fax: 6134453659

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wallace Archibald Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Archibald (CPSO#: 61213 )
Business Address: 110 Craig Street
PO Box 610
Russell Ontario K4R 1E7
613 445-3220

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL BRUCE WALLACE ARCHIBALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCHIBALD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL BRUCE WALLACE ARCHIBALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ARCHIBALD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1989