THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:56:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 205
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057870333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 502-1515 Dufferin Cres
Nanaimo BC V9S 5H6
Phone: 778-87 1707
Fax: 250 713 4422

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy Lapp Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lapp (CPSO#: 61222 )
Business Address: 502-1515 Dufferin Cres
Nanaimo BC V9S 5H6
778 787 1707
Business Address: Huntsville Professional Building
Suite 206
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 787-0333
Business Address: 744 Primrose Avenue
PO Box 38
Qualicum Beach British Columbia V9K 1S7
(250) 594-4904

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 205
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 7057870333
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 502-1515 Dufferin Cres
Nanaimo BC V9S 5H6
Phone: 778-87 1707
Fax: 250 713 4422

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
LOCATION: Bracebridge

HOSPITAL: Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare Huntsville District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Huntsville

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timothy Lapp Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Lapp (CPSO#: 61222 )
Business Address: 502-1515 Dufferin Cres
Nanaimo BC V9S 5H6
778 787 1707
Business Address: Huntsville Professional Building
Suite 206
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville Ontario P1H 1H8
(705) 787-0333
Business Address: 744 Primrose Avenue
PO Box 38
Qualicum Beach British Columbia V9K 1S7
(250) 594-4904

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOHN LAPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TIMOTHY JOHN LAPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LAPP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 1990

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989