THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:54:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 260 Sydenham St
London ON N6A 1W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196793494
Fax: 5196796090
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E.
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500
Extension: 76671
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 871 Trafalgar St
London Ontario N5Z 1E6
Phone: 519 433 3101
Extension: 141
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raymond Egan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Egan (CPSO#: 61239 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Address: 260 Sydenham St
London ON N6A 1W5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 260 Sydenham St
London ON N6A 1W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5196793494
Fax: 5196796090
Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E.
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858500
Extension: 76671
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 871 Trafalgar St
London Ontario N5Z 1E6
Phone: 519 433 3101
Extension: 141
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Child and Adolescent Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Care London - Parkwood Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raymond Egan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Nov 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Egan (CPSO#: 61239 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON N6A 5W9
Business Address: 260 Sydenham St
London ON N6A 1W5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAYMOND RICHARD EGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EGAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RAYMOND RICHARD EGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EGAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1989
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Jun 1989