THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:44:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1989
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204 Richmond Street
Thorold Ontario L2V 5A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-682-1400
Fax: 1-888-206-1673

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Bertley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bertley (CPSO#: 61276 )
Business Address: 204 Richmond St
Thorold ON L2V 5A7

Corporation Name: John Bertley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 204 Richmond Street
Thorold Ontario L2V 5A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-682-1400
Fax: 1-888-206-1673

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 14 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 14 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Bertley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bertley (CPSO#: 61276 )
Business Address: 204 Richmond St
Thorold ON L2V 5A7

Corporation Name: John Bertley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN BERTLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN BERTLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BERTLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989