THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:47:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: Wang, Jodie Lynne Mary Calvert (Used Until: 03 Dec 2024)
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-450 Frederick St
Kitchener ON N2H 2P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-618-9260
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jodie Calvert Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Christie (CPSO#: 61291 )
Business Address: 450 Frederick Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 2P5
5196189260

Corporation Name: Dr. Jodie Calvert Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 May 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. Jodie Calvert Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: Wang, Jodie Lynne Mary Calvert (Used Until: 03 Dec 2024)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-450 Frederick St
Kitchener ON N2H 2P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-618-9260
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Jun 1991
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 20 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jodie Calvert Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Christie (CPSO#: 61291 )
Business Address: 450 Frederick Street
Kitchener Ontario N2H 2P5
5196189260

Corporation Name: Dr. Jodie Calvert Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 May 2024

Corporation Name: Dr. Jodie Calvert Wang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JODIE LYNNE CALVERT CHRISTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JODIE LYNNE CALVERT CHRISTIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHRISTIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 24 Jul 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Aug 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 24 Jul 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 15 Aug 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person. 

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 26 May 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 26 May 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jul 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1989