THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:37:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tecumseh Byng Program
1275 Walker Rd., Unit 10
Windsor Ontario N8Y 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Extension: 52539
Fax: (519) 254-3793

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 05 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Corinna Quan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Quan (CPSO#: 61301 )
Business Address: Unit 10
1275 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8Y 4X9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Tecumseh Byng Program
1275 Walker Rd., Unit 10
Windsor Ontario N8Y 4X9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Extension: 52539
Fax: (519) 254-3793

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 05 Sep 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1989
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 05 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1989
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Corinna Quan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Dec 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Quan (CPSO#: 61301 )
Business Address: Unit 10
1275 Walker Road
Windsor Ontario N8Y 4X9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CORINNA MAE QUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CORINNA MAE QUAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QUAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1985

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1989
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 1989

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989