THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:52:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 603
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 266-4543
Fax: (416) 267-4050

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Randall T. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lee (CPSO#: 61324 )
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Suite 603
Scarborough Ontario M1R 0B1
(416) 266-4543

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 603
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough Ontario M1R 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 266-4543
Fax: (416) 267-4050

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1990
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Randall T. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jan 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lee (CPSO#: 61324 )
Business Address: 520 Ellesmere Road
Suite 603
Scarborough Ontario M1R 0B1
(416) 266-4543

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANDALL TODD LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RANDALL TODD LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 26 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1989

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1989