THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:03:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7 - 49 Wilson St W
Ancaster Ontario L9G 1N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056486500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Justin DeBeer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. De Beer (CPSO#: 61348 )
Business Address: 7 - 49 Wilson Street West
Ancaster Ontario L9G 1N1
(905) 648-6500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7 - 49 Wilson St W
Ancaster Ontario L9G 1N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056486500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 19 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 19 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Justin DeBeer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Jul 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. J. De Beer (CPSO#: 61348 )
Business Address: 7 - 49 Wilson Street West
Ancaster Ontario L9G 1N1
(905) 648-6500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN DE VILLIERS DE BEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE BEER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN DE VILLIERS DE BEER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE BEER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Dec 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Dec 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 1989