THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 06:18:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1989
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Anxiety and Trauma Clinic
Billings Bridge Plaza
202-2277 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7X6
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 613-737-1194
Extension: 0
Fax: 613-737-5884

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Dec 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joy A. Zeglinski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zeglinski (CPSO#: 61374 )
Business Address: Ottawa Anxiety and Trauma Clinic
Billings Bridge Plaza
2277 Riverside Drive
Suite 202
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7X6
(613) 737-1194 Extn: 227

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Anxiety and Trauma Clinic
Billings Bridge Plaza
202-2277 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7X6
Business Email: [email protected]
Phone: 613-737-1194
Extension: 0
Fax: 613-737-5884

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 15 Dec 2004
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2004
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Joy A. Zeglinski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Zeglinski (CPSO#: 61374 )
Business Address: Ottawa Anxiety and Trauma Clinic
Billings Bridge Plaza
2277 Riverside Drive
Suite 202
Ottawa Ontario K1H 7X6
(613) 737-1194 Extn: 227

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOY ANN ZEGLINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEGLINSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOY ANN ZEGLINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZEGLINSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1989

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 1991

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 1989