THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:18:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 166 Main Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2N 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 935-6880
Fax: (289) 206-0641

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jul 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 26 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N Fung & M Kopp Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kopp (CPSO#: 61467 ) Dr. N. Fung (CPSO#: 61465 )
Business Address: 166 Main Street
St Catharines Ontario L2N 4V5
(905) 935-6880

Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CZECH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 166 Main Street
St. Catharines Ontario L2N 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 935-6880
Fax: (289) 206-0641

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jul 2010
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 26 2010
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: N Fung & M Kopp Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Apr 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kopp (CPSO#: 61467 ) Dr. N. Fung (CPSO#: 61465 )
Business Address: 166 Main Street
St Catharines Ontario L2N 4V5
(905) 935-6880

Corporation Name: Van Sittert Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Jul 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL KOPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPP is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL KOPP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOPP is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1988

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1989
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1989