THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:43:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Makerere Univ, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 207
157 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6W 3X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 456-5656
Fax: (905) 456-9572

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 13 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter M. Bikangaga Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bikangaga (CPSO#: 61555 )
Business Address: Suite 207
157 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6W 3X4
(905) 456-5656

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Makerere Univ, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 207
157 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6W 3X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 456-5656
Fax: (905) 456-9572

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 13 Nov 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 1993
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1993
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter M. Bikangaga Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Mar 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bikangaga (CPSO#: 61555 )
Business Address: Suite 207
157 Queen Street East
Brampton Ontario L6W 3X4
(905) 456-5656

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MWESIGYE BIKANGAGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIKANGAGA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER MWESIGYE BIKANGAGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIKANGAGA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Makerere Univ, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 1989