THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:02:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1982
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-6495
Fax: (519) 749-6997
Address: 470 Chrysler Road
suite 28
Brampton Ontario L6S0C1
Phone: (905) 791-3458
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Champagne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Champagne (CPSO#: 61574 )
Business Address: 28 - 470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
(905) 791-3458
Business Address: WRHN Queen's Boulevard
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 749-6495

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-6495
Fax: (519) 749-6997
Address: 470 Chrysler Road
suite 28
Brampton Ontario L6S0C1
Phone: (905) 791-3458
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nuclear Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1991
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nuclear Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1991
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Waterloo Regional Health Network Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Waterloo Regional Health Network
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Champagne Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Champagne (CPSO#: 61574 )
Business Address: 28 - 470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton Ontario L6S 0C1
(905) 791-3458
Business Address: WRHN Queen's Boulevard
911 Queens Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 749-6495

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARO LINE CHAMPAGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMPAGNE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARO LINE CHAMPAGNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHAMPAGNE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Sherbrooke Faculté de Médecine et des Sciences de la Santé, 1982

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 1989