THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:42:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Division, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Radiology
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7R 4C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Extension: x1222
Fax: 905-336-4148

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 May 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Rainy River

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Rawlinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rawlinson (CPSO#: 61611 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Division, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Radiology
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington Ontario L7R 4C4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Extension: x1222
Fax: 905-336-4148

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 May 1995
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 30 1995
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Atikokan Health and Community Services Atikokan
Sante Manitouwadge Health Manitouwadge
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: McCausland Hospital
LOCATION: Terrace Bay

HOSPITAL: Atikokan Health and Community Services
LOCATION: Atikokan

HOSPITAL: Sante Manitouwadge Health
LOCATION: Manitouwadge

HOSPITAL: Wilson Memorial General Hospital
LOCATION: Marathon

HOSPITAL: Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities
LOCATION: Rainy River

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Red Lake

HOSPITAL: Geraldton District Hospital
LOCATION: Geraldton

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Rawlinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Apr 2003
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rawlinson (CPSO#: 61611 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN RAWLINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAWLINSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN RAWLINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAWLINSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Division, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1990
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Feb 1997

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 1995

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1990

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 1989