THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:35:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A-333 George Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-491-8082
Fax: 5194916738

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Al-Saadon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Al-Saadon (CPSO#: 61633 )
Business Address: 333 George St
Sarnia ON N7T 4P5
519-491-8082
Business Address: 2nd Floor
130 Mitton Street North
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6G6
(519) 491-8082

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: A-333 George Street
Sarnia Ontario N7T 4P5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-491-8082
Fax: 5194916738

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Al-Saadon Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jul 2012
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Al-Saadon (CPSO#: 61633 )
Business Address: 333 George St
Sarnia ON N7T 4P5
519-491-8082
Business Address: 2nd Floor
130 Mitton Street North
Sarnia Ontario N7T 6G6
(519) 491-8082

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHALID B H AL-SAADON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SAADON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KHALID B H AL-SAADON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-SAADON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1995
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1989
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2010
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Mar 2010

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2007

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2006

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1995

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 1989