THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:03:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1984
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1720 Howard Avenue
Suite 259
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-4424
Fax: (519) 254-4194

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 29 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hiren Desai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Desai (CPSO#: 61743 )
Business Address: 259 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
(519) 254-4424

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI, MARATHI
Medical School: University of Bombay, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1720 Howard Avenue
Suite 259
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 254-4424
Fax: (519) 254-4194

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 29 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hiren Desai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Desai (CPSO#: 61743 )
Business Address: 259 - 1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor Ontario N8X 5A6
(519) 254-4424

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HIREN BHUPENDRA DESAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESAI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HIREN BHUPENDRA DESAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DESAI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Bombay, 1984

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1991
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1989
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 1991

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Oct 1989