THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:42:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: Ho, Walter I Chie (Used Until: 26 Apr 2001)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CF H Svcs
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 945-1060
Fax: (613) 945-1070

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walter Hoe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hoe (CPSO#: 61769 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 601-7347

General Information

Former Name: Ho, Walter I Chie (Used Until: 26 Apr 2001)
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: CF H Svcs
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0K2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 945-1060
Fax: (613) 945-1070

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 23 Apr 2007
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2007
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Walter Hoe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jul 2009
Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hoe (CPSO#: 61769 )
Business Address: 713 Montreal Road
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
(613) 601-7347

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WALTER HOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WALTER HOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1986

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1989
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 1989