THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:00:25 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1987
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, RUSSIAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 340 Laurier Avenue West
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 794-1438
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Quebec
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colin Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cameron (CPSO#: 61816 )
Business Address: 1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521
Business Address: St. Lawrence Valley Correctional and
Treatment Centre
1804 Highway 2 East
Brockville Ontario K6V 5T1
(613) 341-2870

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, RUSSIAN, SPANISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 340 Laurier Avenue West
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613 794-1438
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 1994
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 1994
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Quebec
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Brockville Mental Health Centre
LOCATION: Brockville

HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Colin Cameron Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Apr 2006
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cameron (CPSO#: 61816 )
Business Address: 1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521
Business Address: St. Lawrence Valley Correctional and
Treatment Centre
1804 Highway 2 East
Brockville Ontario K6V 5T1
(613) 341-2870

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLIN JOHN CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. COLIN JOHN CAMERON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMERON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1987

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1990